Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Cabral, Tarsila Terrana, Do Valle, Robson Lafaete, Wang, Judy, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Liu, Zheng, against 1-20, Does, Cabral, Tarsila Terrana, Do Valle, Robson Lafaete, Wang, Judy, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2023 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This legal document is a complaint regarding a proposal and contract for various home improvement projects. It outlines the details of the work to be done, including hardwood floor installation, interior remodeling, and painting, with an estimated to...
Summons Issued / Filed
Date: March 25, 2024Complaint
Date: March 25, 2024Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: March 25, 2024Stip to Extend Deadline - Responsive Pleading
Date: April 23, 2024Final - Judy Wnag Complaint
Date: March 25, 2024summons
Date: March 25, 2024ccs Wang
Date: March 25, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
August 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Stip to Extend Deadline - Responsive Pleading | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Stip to Extend Deadline - Responsive Pleading | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case ordered consolidated. Lead Case: 24-CIV-01814 Consolidated Case: 23-SCS-00957 |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.