Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
American Parking Management, Inc., Etman, Sharif, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Schoenberger, Richard H, against American Parking Management, Inc., Does 1 To Through 50, Stanford University, The Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Standard Junior University, represented by Beeman, Christopher J., Vierra, Kenneth, Jr, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Greenberg, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGreenberg, Susan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2024 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This document provides information on nonrefundable jury fees and appropriate dispute resolution (ADR) in civil cases. It outlines the deadlines for paying jury fees, scenarios for late payments, waiver based on financial condition, and refundability...
SF34028489
Date: March 25, 2024Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: March 20, 2024Cross Complaint
Date: March 20, 2024Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: March 20, 2024Answer (Unlimited)
Date: March 11, 2024Complaint
Date: February 21, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 21, 2024POS to Summons and XC
Date: March 20, 2024Cross-Complaint (N. Aguilar)
Date: March 20, 2024Summons-Cross-Complaint
Date: March 20, 2024Answer to Complaint
Date: March 11, 2024Complaint-FINAL
Date: February 21, 2024Summons
Date: February 21, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | SF34028489 | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) Answer Answer (Unlimited) Answer |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Advance Jury Fee Defendant Paid Thru E-filing Non Refundable |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of SUMMONS - CROSS-COMPLAINT; CROSS-COMPLAINT Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of SUMMONS - CROSS-COMPLAINT; CROSS-COMPLAINT |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Cross Complaint | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | POS to Summons and XC | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint (N. Aguilar) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.