Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Canyon Lakes Title, Llc, filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) case against Salonga, De'Angelo, S, D, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Finigan, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2024 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint involves CANYON LAKES TITLE, LLC petitioning the court for approval of the transfer of structured settlement payment rights. The Payee, D.S., is a resident of SAN MATEO, California, and the Obligor, BHG Structured Settlements Inc., has...
First Amended Complaint
Date: April 04, 2024Declaration in Support
Date: April 12, 2024Affidavit of Mailing
Date: April 17, 2024Proof of Service by
Date: February 20, 2024Supplemental
Date: April 23, 2024Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: February 13, 2024Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: April 15, 2024Motion
Date: February 15, 2024Petition
Date: February 08, 202496610SUPPL0016df
Date: April 24, 2024NTC of Remote Appearance Order
Date: April 12, 2024NTC of Remote Appearance
Date: April 12, 2024Declaration Final 040924
Date: April 12, 2024Response Final 040924
Date: April 12, 2024NTC of Remote Appearance Order
Date: April 10, 2024NTC of Remote Appearance
Date: April 10, 2024Declaration Final 040924
Date: April 10, 2024Response Final 040924
Date: April 10, 202495366FIRST00fceb
Date: April 05, 202492295Proof0039df
Date: February 20, 202492050NOTIC001cda
Date: February 15, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for Approval FOR APPROVAL TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA INSURANCE CODE 10134 ET SEQ. Judge: Finigan, Jeffrey R. |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 96610SUPPL0016df | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Supplemental EXHIBIT H TO FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHT Supplemental EXHIBIT H TO FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing ORDER REGARDING REMOTE APPEARANCE Affidavit of Mailing ORDER REGARDING REMOTE APPEARANCE |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Remote Appearance Type: HEARING ON PETITIONSigned by: JUDGE FINIGANDate Signed: 4/ Order Regarding Remote Appearance Type: HEARING ON PETITION Signed by: JUDGE FINIGAN Date Signed: 4/15/2024 |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Case Management and Trial Setting Conference 04/15/2024 Case Management and Trial Setting Conference Judge: Finigan, Jeffrey R. |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF BRENNAN S.NEVILLE IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE OF SPECIALLY APPEA Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF BRENNAN S. NEVILLE IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE OF SPECIALLY APPEARING INTERESTED PARTY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEBRASKA TO PETITION AND FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR APPROVAL FOR TRANSFER OF PAYMENT RIGHTS [BY AND BETWEEN DE'ANGELO SALONGA AND CANYON LAKES TITLE, LLC, PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA INSURANCE CODE 10134, ET SEQ. |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply RESPONSE OF SPECIALLYAPPEARING INTERESTED PARTYBERKS Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply RESPONSE OF SPECIALLY APPEARING INTERESTED PARTY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEBRASKA TO PETITION AND FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR APPROVAL FOR TRANSFER OF PAYMENT RIGHTS [BY AND BETWEEN DE'ANGELO SALONGA AND CANYON LAKES TITLE, LLC, PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA INSURANCE CODE 10134, ET SEQ.] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.