Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Cohen, Amy E., Cohen, Jonah I., Taran, David, Taran, Randy, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bender, Marc D., against Does 1 - 50, Inclusive, Taran, David, Taran, Randy, represented by Mlnarik, John L, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Swope, V. Raymond presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2024 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Cross Complaint
Date: April 08, 2024SummonsCrossComplaint
Date: April 10, 202424.04.09 Answer to Complaint
Date: April 09, 202424.03.29 Executed Cross-Complaint
Date: April 08, 202424.04.08 Proof of Service by FirstClass Mail
Date: April 08, 2024SummonsCrossComplaint
Date: April 08, 202424.04.04 Answer to Complaint
Date: April 04, 202424.03.29 Executed Cross-Complaint
Date: April 02, 2024Proof of Service by FirstClass MailCivil
Date: April 02, 2024SummonsCrossComplaint
Date: April 02, 2024Proof of Service by FirstClass MailCivil
Date: March 29, 2024SummonsCrossComplaint
Date: March 29, 202424.03.29 Executed Cross-Complaint
Date: March 29, 2024Complaint
Date: February 02, 2024Summons
Date: February 02, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
June 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | 24.04.17 Proof of Service of Summons | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | SummonsCrossComplaint | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | 24.04.09 Answer to Complaint | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Cross Complaint | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | 24.03.29 Executed Cross-Complaint | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | 24.04.08 Proof of Service by FirstClass Mail | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | SummonsCrossComplaint | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | 24.04.04 Answer to Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.