Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Muhammad Nuri Ibn, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Beitmirza Bretil, against Ean Holdings Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Pappoe Herman A., represented by Bozoghlian Esq. Rodrigo, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with Shirley K. Watkins presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2023 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-17T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-28T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: NURI IBN MUHAMMAD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-10-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: HERMAN A. PAPPOE (Defendant)
Date: 2023-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 18, 2023Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: NURI IBN MUHAMMAD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-29T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: HERMAN A. PAPPOE (Defendant); As to: NURI IBN MUHAMMAD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: NURI IBN MUHAMMAD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: NURI IBN MUHAMMAD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: NURI IBN MUHAMMAD (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-09-25T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: HERMAN A. PAPPOE (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-18T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 28, 2023Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: March 28, 2023Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 28, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 28, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 28, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 28, 2023Complaint
Date: March 28, 2023Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: March 28, 2023Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 29, 2023Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 30, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.