Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Plancarte Miguel, filed a(n) General Consumer - Consumer case represented by Kirnos Roger, against General Motors Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Major Cameron, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with Shirley K. Watkins presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2023 |
CategoryProduct Liability ? Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act¿(Lemon Law) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Consumer |
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Order Re: FSC/Trial Policies; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 06, 2023Case Management Statement; Filed by: MIGUEL PLANCARTE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MIGUEL PLANCARTE (Plaintiff)
Date: September 29, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: MIGUEL PLANCARTE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Order Re: FSC/Trial Policies; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 09, 2023Complaint
Date: March 09, 2023Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 09, 2023Demand for Jury Trial
Date: March 09, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 09, 2023Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 27, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.