Del Rey Vacations Llc A California Limited Liability Company,
filed a(n)
Quiet Title -
Property
case
represented by
Johnson S.V. Stuart,
against
The City Of Los Angeles,
The Richard L. Everett Trust Dated May 15 2021,
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
Torrance with Deirdre H. Hill presiding.
Case Details for
Del Rey Vacations Llc A California Limited Liability Company v. The City Of Los Angeles
, et al.
Case Events for
Del Rey Vacations Llc A California Limited Liability Company v. The City Of Los Angeles
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
April 05, 2024
Hearing
Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default
April 05, 2024
Hearing
Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503 Case Management Conference
January 22, 2024
Docket Event
Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Del Rey Vacations, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: The Richard L. Everett Trust Dated May 15, 2021 (Defendant)
January 16, 2024
Docket Event
Case reassigned to Torrance Courthouse in Department B - Hon. Douglas W. Sterneffective ; Reason: Inventory Transfer
January 12, 2024
Docket Event
Updated -- Case Management Conference: Location changed from Department M to Department B
January 12, 2024
Docket Event
Updated -- Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default: Location changed from Department M to Department B
January 12, 2024
Docket Event
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
January 04, 2024
Docket Event
Updated -- STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO REQUEST (1) THE TRIAL COURT RETAIN JURISDICTION UNDER C.C.P. ¿ 664.6 AND (2) DISMISSAL: Filed By: The Richard L. Everett Trust Dated May 15, 2021 (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date:
January 04, 2024
Docket Event
STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO REQUEST (1) THE TRIAL COURT RETAIN JURISDICTION UNDER C.C.P. ¿ 664.6 AND (2) DISMISSAL; Signed and Filed by: The Richard L. Everett Trust Dated May 15, 2021 (Defendant); As to: Del Rey Vacations, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)
December 05, 2023
Docket Event
Notice Filing of Recorded Notice of Withdrawal and Release of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Del Rey Vacations, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: The Richard L. Everett Trust Dated May 15, 2021 (Defendant); The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)