Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Castillo Javier, Flores Maria, Ruiz Constantino, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Zeesman Alexander Joshua, Zeesman Diana, against Castillo Javier, Flores Maria, Gallegos Denis, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, The Estate Of Denis Gallegos, (total of 5) See All represented by Galang Britton P., Gonzalez Rodolfo, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance with Deirdre H. Hill presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2023 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseTorrance |
Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Constantino Ruiz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-11-08T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-27T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Javier Castillo (Defendant)
Date: 2023-11-09T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Javier Castillo (Defendant)
Date: 2023-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Javier Castillo (Defendant)
Date: 2023-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Javier Castillo (Defendant); As to: Constantino Ruiz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-11-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Maria Flores (Defendant); As to: Javier Castillo (Defendant)
Date: 2023-11-28T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Javier Castillo (Defendant); As to: Maria Flores (Defendant)
Date: 2023-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Maria Flores (Defendant)
Date: 2024-01-08T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Maria Flores (Defendant); As to: Javier Castillo (Defendant)
Date: 2023-11-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Javier Castillo (Cross-Complainant)
Date: January 12, 2024Case Management Statement; Filed by: Maria Flores (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2024-01-08T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Maria Flores (Defendant); As to: Constantino Ruiz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: Constantino Ruiz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Constantino Ruiz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2024-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 16, 2024Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-01-10T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 27, 2023Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 27, 2023Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: July 27, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 27, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND COVERSHEET ADDENDUM
Date: July 27, 2023Complaint - COMPLAINT PERSONAL INJURY, GENERAL NEGLIGENCE
Date: July 27, 2023Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: July 27, 2023Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: August 01, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 01, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.