Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Xiao Junqiao, against Does 1 Through 10 Inclusive, Pikowski Marc E, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance with Ronald F. Frank presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2023 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseTorrance |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: August 16, 2023Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by: Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: August 16, 2023Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: November 30, 2023Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: June 05, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 05, 2023Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 05, 2023Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 05, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 07, 2023Complaint - COMPLAINT - (1) ACCOUNT STATED
Date: June 05, 2023Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: June 05, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.