Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Whitaker Brian, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Gavrilescu Claudia, Potter Mark Dee, against Davidson Christopher, Does 1 Through 50 Inclusive, M D'S Hermosa Beach Inc. A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance with Deirdre H. Hill presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeirdre H. Hill Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2023 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseTorrance |
Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-24T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff)
Date: September 21, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-17T00:00:00Default entered as to Christopher Davidson; On the Complaint filed by Brian Whitaker on
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: April 17, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM
Date: April 17, 2023Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 17, 2023Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 17, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 17, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 19, 2023Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: April 17, 2023Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: April 19, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.