Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Whitaker Brian, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Potter Mark Dee, against 8 Leaves Properties Llc A California Limited Liability Company; And Does 1 Through 50 Inclusive, Does 1 Through 50 Inclusive, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance with Ronald F. Frank presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald F. Frank Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 14, 2023 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseTorrance |
Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-14T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-06-20T00:00:00Request FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff)
Date: August 15, 2023Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff)
Date: August 16, 2023Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: April 14, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM
Date: April 14, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 14, 2023Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 14, 2023Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: April 14, 2023Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 14, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 20, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.