Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Herrera Teresa, Perez Isaac, filed a(n) General Consumer - Consumer case represented by Kirnos Roger, against Ford Motor Company A Delaware Corporation, South Bay Ford Inc. A California Corporation Dba South Bay Ford Lincoln, represented by Lally Ravinder Kaur, Mortenson Michael D, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance with David K. Reinert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 24, 2023 |
CategoryProduct Liability ? Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act¿(Lemon Law) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Consumer |
Filing Court HouseTorrance |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 25, 2024Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: TERESA HERRERA (Plaintiff); ISAAC PEREZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: TERESA HERRERA (Plaintiff); ISAAC PEREZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-09-07T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: TERESA HERRERA (Plaintiff); ISAAC PEREZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-10-02T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-04T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: TERESA HERRERA (Plaintiff); ISAAC PEREZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-29T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: TERESA HERRERA (Plaintiff); ISAAC PEREZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-10-05T00:00:00Complaint - 1. VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY ACT - BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY
Date: March 24, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 24, 2023Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 24, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: March 24, 2023Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 24, 2023Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: March 24, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.