Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BOOKER, VERNINITA E. - DECEDENT
On December 22, 2023 a decedent's estate (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Jonathan L. Rosenbloom presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 22, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 27, 2024
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Decedent's Estate (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Estate Administration
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2025 | hearing |
Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report |
|
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 11, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held Judge: Rosenbloom Jonathan L |
|
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing ( ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice - Petition to Administer Estate ( ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication (Proof of Publication ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial) Filed by Attorney |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Supplement (To Petition For Probate And For Letters Of Administration/IAEA-Limited Authority ) Filed by Attorney |