Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Digirolamo Craig William, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Harper Tamara Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel Juarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel Juarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2023 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2025 | Hearing |
Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report |
|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order - Probate Filed by Attorney |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held Judge: Juarez Daniel |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Supplement (Supplement to Probate Petition and Declaration of Petitioner re Waiver of Bond ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative Filed by Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.