Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Pfefferkorn Lisa, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Gentile Emanuela, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Deborah L. Christian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2023 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2025 | Hearing |
Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held Judge: Christian Deborah L. |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Nomination (Nomination (Nominations) ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Nomination (Nomination (Nominations) ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.