Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Keough Riley, Lockwood Michael Dean, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Greco David Gerald, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Scaduto Lynn H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2023 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)
Date: June 13, 2023Notice - Lodging - Notice of Lodging Under Seal
Date: June 14, 2023Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing
Date: June 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice of Entry of Order ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Order (ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Declaration ISO Ex Parte Petition ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Petition (Ex Parte Petition for Approval of Settlement Agreement ) Filed by Attorney |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 79, Scaduto, Lynn H., Presiding Motion Hearing - Held Judge: Scaduto Lynn H. |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (Notice of Continued Hearing ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 05, 2023 | Hearing |
Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Motion Hearing |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.