Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Tsai Mitchell, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Huang Joanne C, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gus T. May presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 24, 2023 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint is a petition for probate of a lost will and for letters testamentary or letters of administration. The petitioner, Mitchell Tsai, is requesting that the decedent's will and codicils, if any, be admitted to probate. The petitioner also...
Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)
Date: March 24, 2023Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication
Date: April 06, 2023Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010
Date: April 18, 2023Minute Order
Date: May 02, 2023Supplement - Petitioner's Supplement to Petition for Probate (Comment)
Date: June 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2024 | Hearing |
Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report |
|
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letters (Initial) - Decedent's Estate Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal (Final $429,698.16 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - Probate | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Granted (The Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial) filed on by Mitchell Tsai ) | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held Judge: May Gus T. |
|
June 30, 2023 | Hearing |
Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.