Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Nakamura Brian M., filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Huestis Samuel M, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel Juarez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2023 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing
Date: March 02, 2023Minute Order
Date: May 11, 2023Bond - Liberty Mutual
Date: May 18, 2023Order
Date: May 26, 2023Notice - Notice of Entry of Order
Date: May 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice of Entry of Order ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 30, 2023 | Notice - Notice of Entry of Order | ||
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 26, 2023 | Order | ||
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bond (Liberty Mutual ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 18, 2023 | Bond - Liberty Mutual | ||
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Trust (Order on Petition for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Appointment of Trustees ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Judge: Juarez Daniel |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.