Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lightfoot Todd, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Staker Kevin Glen, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jonathan L. Rosenbloom presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2023 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Declaration - Todd Lightfoot, Jr.
Date: January 17, 2023Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)
Date: January 17, 2023Proof of Subscribing Witness
Date: January 17, 2023Notice - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Date: January 23, 2023Will Deposited - 4 Pgs - 11/11/2022
Date: January 26, 2023Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Bond
Date: January 30, 2023Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative
Date: January 27, 2023Declination to Act
Date: January 30, 2023Proof of Publication
Date: January 31, 2023Proof of Publication - 2/21/23
Date: February 03, 2023Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Probate
Date: February 17, 2023Supplement - Proof of Service
Date: February 17, 2023Supplement - Second Supplement to Petition for Probate
Date: February 17, 2023Will - Admitted
Date: February 21, 2023Minute Order
Date: February 21, 2023Order - Appointing Personal Representative
Date: March 03, 2023Letters (Initial) - Decedent's Estate - Letters - Decedent's Estate (DE-150)
Date: March 06, 2023Notice - Notice to Medi-Cal
Date: March 22, 2023Inventory & Appraisal - final $1,017,302.00
Date: March 22, 2023Notice - Notice to FTB
Date: March 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - Final Distribution | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Accounting - Final Decedent Estate (Proposed Order Approving Petition for Final Distribution... ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 11, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: Rosenbloom Jonathan L |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | TERM: Approval of Final Distribution | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Waiver - (No Fee) (Acceptance of Trustee and Waiver of Account ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.