Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Downtown L.A. Law Group, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Morrow Andrew M., against Goldsmith An Individual Phyllis, Integrated Medical Center Unknown Entity, Neurological Institute Of Los Angeles Unknown Entity, Pledge Medical Unknown Entity, Precise Imaging Unknown Entity, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2023 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint is a summons notifying the defendant, Phyllis Goldsmith, and several unknown entities, including Medical, Integrated Medical Center, Precise Imaging, and Neurological Institute of Los Angeles, that they are being sued by the plaintiff,...
Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-10-09T00:00:00Declaration OF SAKO DEMIRJIAN IN SUPPORT; Filed by: DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-12-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-11-28T00:00:00Complaint in Interpleader
Date: September 11, 2023Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: September 11, 2023Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 11, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.