Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Juarez Campos Luis A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Yang Michelle, against Ford Motor Company, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Robert S. Draper presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2023 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-05T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: LUIS A. JUAREZ CAMPOS (Plaintiff); As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: LUIS A. JUAREZ CAMPOS (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: LUIS A. JUAREZ CAMPOS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-29T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-15T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: LUIS A. JUAREZ CAMPOS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-29T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 09, 2023Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: March 09, 2023Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 09, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 09, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 09, 2023Complaint
Date: March 09, 2023Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: March 09, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 15, 2023Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 21, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.