Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Velasquez Byron, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Sirmabekian Sarkis, against Baronian Harout, Baronian Stella, Harout Transportation Inc., Harout Transportation Inc. A California Corporation, Montebello Adult Day Health Care Center, (total of 6) See All represented by Sterman Karina Bess, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2023 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Updated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: BYRON VELASQUEZ (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date:
Date: 2023-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case.) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-20T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: BYRON VELASQUEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: BYRON VELASQUEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 14, 2023Case Management Statement; Filed by: BYRON VELASQUEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: BYRON VELASQUEZ (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-12-04T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 09, 2023Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: March 09, 2023Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 09, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 10, 2023Complaint
Date: March 09, 2023Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: March 09, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 09, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 09, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.