Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Fuentes Irais, Surio Jose, filed a(n) General Consumer - Consumer case represented by Kirnos Roger, against Fca Us Llc, Glendale Dodge Llc Dba Glendale Dodge Chrysler Jeep, represented by Vawter Laura D., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Armen Tamzarian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2023 |
CategoryProduct Liability ? Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act¿(Lemon Law) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Consumer |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: GLENDALE DODGE, LLC (Defendant); FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-10-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Order Regarding Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act Action; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Trial Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JOSE SURIO (Plaintiff); IRAIS FUENTES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant); As to: JOSE SURIO (Plaintiff); IRAIS FUENTES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-11-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: JOSE SURIO (Plaintiff); IRAIS FUENTES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-10-11T00:00:00Order Regarding Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act Action; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: GLENDALE DODGE, LLC (Defendant); FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: JOSE SURIO (Plaintiff); IRAIS FUENTES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Trial Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: GLENDALE DODGE, LLC (Defendant); FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-10-31T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-12-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: March 09, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 09, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 09, 2023Demand for Jury Trial
Date: March 09, 2023Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: March 09, 2023Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 09, 2023Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: March 09, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.