Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Allenby Llc, Haygood Llc, filed a(n) Other Writ /Judicial Review (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Tsai Lisa S., against Rogers Jeremy K., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Curtis A. Kin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2023 |
CategoryOther Writ /Judicial Review (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Allenby, LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2023-10-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Allenby, LLC (Petitioner); Haygood, LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2023-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: January 22, 2024Memorandum - INDEX OF EXHIBITS AND EXHIBITS 1-17
Date: June 22, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 22, 2023Petition - PETITION PETITION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF A FOREIGN SUBPOENA
Date: June 22, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 22, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.