Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Perez Rain Enrique, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Martin Gregory, against Panneerselvan Senthamizhselvan, Uber Technologies Inc., represented by Andrews Alyssa Kathleen, Brown Russell Ellis, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Helen Zukin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 04, 2023 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Trial Preparation Order (Jury Trial); Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 02, 2024Answer; Filed by: Uber Technologies, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Rain Enrique Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: December 08, 2023Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-10-04T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Rain Enrique Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: March 21, 2024Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-10-06T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Senthamizhselvan Panneerselvan (Defendant)
Date: March 18, 2024Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Rain Enrique Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: March 21, 2024Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Uber Technologies, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2024-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Uber Technologies, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2024-03-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.