Kleinman An Individual Meredith,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Grossman Brian M.,
against
Birdsong Central Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company,
Srivastava An Individual Gaurav,
Srivastava An Individual Sharon,
represented by
Nelson Vernon,
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
Santa Monica with Mark A. Young presiding.
Case Details for
Kleinman An Individual Meredith v. Birdsong Central Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company
, et al.
Case Events for
Kleinman An Individual Meredith v. Birdsong Central Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
March 12, 2024
Hearing
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Case Management Conference
December 07, 2023
Docket Event
Answer; Filed by: Birdsong Central LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Sharon Srivastava, an individual (Defendant); Gaurav Srivastava, an individual (Defendant); As to: Meredith Kleinman, an individual (Plaintiff)
November 09, 2023
Docket Event
Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Meredith Kleinman, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Gaurav Srivastava, an individual (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No
November 09, 2023
Docket Event
Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Meredith Kleinman, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Birdsong Central LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No
November 09, 2023
Docket Event
Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Meredith Kleinman, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Sharon Srivastava, an individual (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No
September 25, 2023
Docket Event
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
September 25, 2023
Docket Event
Case assigned to Hon. Mark A. Young in Department M Santa Monica Courthouse
September 25, 2023
Hearing
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M
Judge: Mark A. Young
September 14, 2023
Docket Event
Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Meredith Kleinman, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Birdsong Central LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Sharon Srivastava, an individual (Defendant); Gaurav Srivastava, an individual (Defendant)