Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Whitaker Brian, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Potter Mark Dee, against Southwest Spirits & Wine Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Cha John S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Craig D. Karlan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig D. Karlan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 03, 2023 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 17, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-04T00:00:00Summons on Complaint (1st); Issued and Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: April 03, 2023Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: April 03, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 03, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 03, 2023Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 03, 2023Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: April 03, 2023Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 03, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 04, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.