Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gagliano Frank, filed a(n) Negligent Breach - Commercial case represented by Russell Dennis, against Coro Community Management And Consulting Llc. A California Limited Liability Company;, Gholami Sahar, Khalili Matt, Mizrahi Robin, Sedrak Michael Fayez, (total of 6) See All represented by Kosnett Louis V., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Harry Jay Ford III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
CategoryNegligent Breach Of Contract/Warranty (No Fraud) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeNegligent Breach |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: FRANK GAGLIANO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-09-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 21, 2023Complaint
Date: March 21, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 21, 2023Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 21, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 22, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.