Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Oygenblik An Individual Sergey, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Franco Brianna Yselle, Treyzon Boris, against Does 1 - 10 Inclusive, Terry An Individual Andrea, represented by Martin Francis Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Helen Zukin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2023 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Notice of Appearance; Filed by: SERGEY OYGENBLIK, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: SERGEY OYGENBLIK, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: ANDREA TERRY, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Rescheduled Hearing) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: ANDREA TERRY, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: SERGEY OYGENBLIK, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: ANDREA TERRY, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-21T00:00:00Trial Preparation Order (Jury Trial); Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 23, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 09, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 09, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 09, 2023Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 09, 2023Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 09, 2023Complaint
Date: March 09, 2023Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: March 09, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.