Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Madrigal, Christina, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Amazon.Com Services Llc, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Booska, Steven presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2023 |
CategorySmall Claims $1501 - $5000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Trial: Short Cause
Judge: Juris, Leslie |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Exhibits Lodged | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL |
|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Request: Postponement (Small Claims) | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL |
|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Authorization: Appear on Behalf of Party Authorization to Appear (Comment) |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request: Postponement (Small Claims) Request to Postpone Trial (Requests) |
|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Trial: Short Cause
Judge: Booska, Steven |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim (Amended) (No change in no claim amount) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.