Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Sheldon, Derek, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2023 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a petition filed by Derek Sheldon against Lee Sheldon, the successor trustee of the Verall Leroy Sheldon Revocable Trust. The petitioner alleges that upon the death of Verall Leroy Sheldon, the trust became irrevocable. The petition...
Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: January 09, 2024Petition Hearing
Date: March 12, 2024Petition Hearing
Date: December 05, 2023Notice
Date: December 18, 2023Minute Order
Date: January 09, 2024Stipulation for Temporary Judge
Date: December 05, 2023Petn or Opp - Commence a Proceeding under the Probate Code
Date: October 20, 2023Petition Hearing
Date: January 09, 2024Minute Order
Date: December 05, 2023Citation Issued
Date: October 20, 2023Proof of Service
Date: November 16, 2023Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: November 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2024 |
Notice of Hearing Petition Hearing Petition toCOmpel Accounting; Remove Trustee; Appoint Successor Trustee; Continued Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
January 09, 2024 | Notice of Hearing - Probate | ||
January 09, 2024 |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
||
January 09, 2024 |
Probate Minutes Petition Hearing Petition to Compel Accounting; Remove Trustee; Appoint Successor Trustee; Continued Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
January 09, 2024 |
Tentative Ruling - Probate The Court will hear from counsel. |
||
December 18, 2023 |
Notice of Continued Hearing Notice |
||
December 05, 2023 |
Probate Minutes Petition Hearing Petition to Compel Accounting; Remove Trustee; Appoint Successor Trustee Judge: Trulin, Tamara M |
||
December 05, 2023 | Stipulation for Temporary Judge | ||
December 05, 2023 |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
||
December 05, 2023 |
Tentative Ruling - Probate The Court will hear from counsel. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.