Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Manrao, Preston, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2023 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Review Hearing
Date: November 05, 2024Creditor's Claim
Date: December 11, 2023Request for Special Notice
Date: December 11, 2023Notice
Date: November 13, 2023Proof of Mailing
Date: November 08, 2023Minute Order
Date: November 07, 2023Order Appointing Administrator
Date: November 07, 2023Letters Issued
Date: November 07, 2023Petition Hearing
Date: November 07, 2023Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Date: September 20, 2023Proof or Affidavit of Publication
Date: October 05, 2023Petition to Administer Estate
Date: September 18, 2023Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative
Date: September 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2024 |
Notice of Administration of the Estate to Creditors Review Hearing Final Distribution Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
December 11, 2023 | Creditor's Claim | ||
December 11, 2023 | Request for Special Notice | ||
November 13, 2023 |
Notice of Administration of the Estate to Creditors Notice |
||
November 08, 2023 | Proof of Mailing | ||
November 07, 2023 |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
||
November 07, 2023 |
Order Appointing Administrator
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
November 07, 2023 |
Tentative Ruling - Probate The petition is granted, letters of administration with full authority shall issue, bond is waived, Jane Dolan is appointed as probate referee and a final distribution hearing is set for November 5, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. In the event the Administrator is unable to file the petition for final distribution seven (7) days prior to the final distribution hearing, a status report shall be filed within seven (7) days of the hearing. The Court will sign the form of order submitted by counsel. |
||
November 07, 2023 | Letters Issued | ||
November 07, 2023 |
Probate Minutes Petition Hearing Petition for Letter of Administration Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.