Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Langlitz, Toni Lynne, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 26, 2023 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a petition for probate of the last will and testament of Margaret Ellen Morrison, also known as Margaret E. Morrison and Margaret Morrison. The petitioner, Toni Lynne Langlitz, requests that the decedent's will be admitted to probat...
Proof of Mailing
Date: December 15, 2023Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim
Date: November 08, 2023Notice
Date: January 19, 2024Review Hearing
Date: June 04, 2024Inventory and Appraisal
Date: January 19, 2024Notice of Proposed Action
Date: January 19, 2024Creditor's Claim
Date: June 30, 2023Notice
Date: June 30, 2023Proof of Mailing
Date: June 06, 2023Will - Filed
Date: June 06, 2023Minute Order
Date: June 06, 2023Letters Issued
Date: June 06, 2023Petition Hearing
Date: June 06, 2023Order Appointing Executor
Date: June 06, 2023Statement
Date: April 26, 2023Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Date: April 26, 2023Petition to Administer Estate
Date: April 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2024 |
Inventory and Appraisal Final Review Hearing Final Distribution Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
January 19, 2024 |
Notice to Creditors Notice |
||
January 19, 2024 |
Inventory and Appraisal Final Inventory and Appraisal |
||
January 19, 2024 | Notice of Proposed Action | ||
December 15, 2023 | Proof of Mailing | ||
November 08, 2023 |
Allowance of Creditors Claim Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim |
||
June 30, 2023 |
Toni Lynn Langlitz's Creditor's Claim in the Amount of $1,884.25 Creditor's Claim |
||
June 30, 2023 |
Notice of Administration to Creditors Notice |
||
June 06, 2023 | Proof of Mailing | ||
June 06, 2023 | Will - Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.