Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wilson Michael, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Tashjian Vatche Diran, against Osipova Yulianna, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pasadena with Harvey A. Silberman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HousePasadena |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations) ) Filed by Respondent |
|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation - Order for Custody and/or Visitation | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Stipulation & Order - Custody and/or Visitation (Proposed Stipulation & Order - Custody and/or Visitation - $20.00 (Orders) ) Filed by Respondent |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 21, 2023 | Hearing |
in Department L, Silberman, Harvey A., Presiding RFO - Family Law - Held - Order Made Judge: Silberman Harvey A. |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service - Electronic (Proof of Service) ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Declaration (Declarations) ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Respondent |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Proof of Service (Comment) ) Filed by Respondent |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration (Responsive Declaration (Declarations) ) Filed by Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.