Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Shasta County. This case was filed in Shasta County Superior Courts Superior with McKee, Monique D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2023 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedApril 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationShasta County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Hearing |
Further Proceedings
Judge: McKee, Monique D |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Request | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Documents Received | |
March 11, 2024 | Hearing |
Further Proceedings
Judge: McKee, Monique D |
|
February 26, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing - Probate/Trusts
Judge: McKee, Monique D |
|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing - Probate | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Amended Petition Filed | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Subscribing Witness | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof / Affidavit of Publication | |
January 29, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Judge: McKee, Monique D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.