Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lewis Aaron, Mfar Inc. A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Karp Adam L, against Mckinney Marlon, Nwbc Group Inc. A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Lee W. Tsao presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLee W. Tsao Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2023 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
This complaint is a summons notifying the defendant, Marlon McKinney and NWBC Group, Inc., that they are being sued by the plaintiff, Aaron Lewis and MFAR, Inc. The defendant is informed that they have 30 calendar days to respond to the summons and f...
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-05T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-31T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-31T00:00:00Order /RULING; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: AARON LEWIS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-31T00:00:00Complaint
Date: August 31, 2023Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 31, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.