Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Romero Maria Socorro, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Romero Miguel, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Long Beach with Gary D. Roberts presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary D. Roberts Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseLong Beach |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2024 | Hearing |
Department S16 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802 Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 02, 2023 | Hearing |
in Department S16, Weiner, Timothy M., Presiding Short Cause Trial - Held - Order Made Judge: Weiner Timothy M. |
|
November 02, 2023 | Hearing |
Department S16 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802 Short Cause Trial |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Lodging (Notice - Lodging Rentometer ) Filed by Respondent |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (Respondent's Exhibit List and Exhibits ) Filed by Respondent |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Proof of Electronic Service ) Filed by Respondent |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (RE: LOAN TO BE OBTAINED BY RESPONDENT, ETC. ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 29, 2023 | Hearing |
in Department Y, Roberts, Gary D, Presiding Mandatory Settlement Conference - Held - Not Settled, Trial to Stand Judge: Roberts Gary D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.