Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Reyes Carrada, Gonzalo, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Acevedo, Betzy, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Ottenweller, Peter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2023 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report - DV Calendar | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order Acevedo, Betzy (Age 19) Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
DV Notice of Hearing 1/16/2023 @1:30pm D22 |
|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Submitted Notice of Court Hearing & Temporary Restraining Order |
|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order Acevedo, Betzy Exp. 1/16/2024 Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Subsequent DV Prevention w/ Minor Children | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Re: Notice & Delivery of DV TRO for review on 12/28/23 |
|
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: Bertoli, James G |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.