We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alejo, Bryan ,
filed a(n)
Custody,Visitation -
Family
case
against
De La Cruz, Alexis ,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
Superior with WERSCHING, ERIC J. presiding.
Filing Date
October 17, 2023
Category
Custody And / Or Visitation
Last Refreshed
October 18, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Matter Type
Custody,Visitation
Filing Court House
Superior
Case Events for
Alejo, Bryan v. De La Cruz, Alexis
Date
Type
Description
January 09, 2024
Hearing
HEARING - RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION / CHILD SUPPORT
December 27, 2023
Hearing
APPOINTMENT - MEDIATION
October 17, 2023
Docket Event
SUMMONS - PARENTAGE / CUSTODY & SUPPORT 10/17/2023
October 17, 2023
Docket Event
REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 10/17/2023
October 17, 2023
Docket Event
RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION / CHILD SUPPORT 10/17/2023 Amount:$60.00
October 17, 2023
Docket Event
ORDER - ATTEND FAMILY MEDIATION 10/17/2023
Get Document
October 17, 2023
Docket Event
DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 10/17/2023
October 17, 2023
Docket Event
PETITION - CUSTODY & SUPPORT MINOR CHILD 10/17/2023 Amount:$435.00
October 17, 2023
Docket Event
ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 10/17/2023
October 17, 2023
Docket Event
DECLARATION - SUPPORT OF MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT 10/17/2023
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.