Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Delgado, Luna, filed a(n) Other case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts Superior with WERSCHING, ERIC J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2023 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
PETITION - CHANGE OF NAME 09/21/2023
Date: September 21, 2023DECREE - CHANGE OF NAME 11/13/2023
Date: November 13, 2023MINUTE ORDER 11/13/2023
Date: November 13, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE - PUBLICATION 10/24/2023
Date: October 24, 2023OSC - CHANGE OF NAME 09/21/2023
Date: September 21, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.