Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Shasta County. This case was filed in Shasta County Superior Courts Superior with Stomberg, Nannette J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2023 |
CategoryPetition For Custody And Support Of Minor Child |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationShasta County, CA |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2024 | Hearing |
*Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Stomberg, Nannette J |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support (Governmental) | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Stomberg, Nannette J |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Fee Waiver for Petitioner/Plaintiff | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons (Uniform Parentage-Petition for Custody and Support) | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Custody and Support of Minor Children |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.