Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Shasta County. This case was filed in Shasta County Superior Courts Superior with Gibson, Gary G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2023 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationShasta County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2024 | Hearing |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Gibson, Gary G |
|
January 26, 2024 | Hearing |
DV Temporary Restraining Order Hearing
Judge: Gibson, Gary G |
|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (in Person) (CLETS) (Domestic Violence) | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Granting Fee Waiver for Defendant/Respondent | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Irregular Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.