Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rahman, Faiz, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Law Office Of Robert Beauchamp, against Ghias, Bushra, represented by Envision Family Law Llp, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts Superior with WERSCHING, ERIC J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 11, 2023 |
CategoryLegal Separation With Child |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
SUMMONS - AMENDED PETITION 07/19/2023
Date: 2023-07-19T00:00:00DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 07/11/2023
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00PETITION - DISSOLUTION 07/11/2023 Amount:$435.00
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00ORDER - ATTEND FAMILY MEDIATION - REMOTE 07/14/2023
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 07/11/2023
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - CIVIL 07/28/2023
Date: July 28, 2023SUMMONS 07/11/2023
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 08/14/2023
Date: August 14, 2023SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 07/19/2023
Date: 2023-07-19T00:00:00RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION 07/14/2023 Amount:$60.00
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 07/28/2023
Date: July 28, 2023PETITION - AMENDED 07/19/2023 LEGAL SEPARATION
Date: 2023-07-19T00:00:00REQUEST - JUDICIAL NOTICE 08/31/2023 REQUEST - JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: August 31, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 08/14/2023
Date: August 14, 2023STATUS - MEDIATION 09/06/2023
Date: September 06, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE - ELECTRONIC 08/31/2023 PROOF OF SERVICE - ELECTRONIC
Date: August 31, 2023RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 08/14/2023
Date: August 14, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.