Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Art Chan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kathryn Cecilia Curry, against Artson Group International Trade, Inc., Michelle Fang, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2023 |
CategoryOther Contract Unlimited (37) |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Summons: Issued/Filed
Date: July 13, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 13, 2023Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: July 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 23CV418969 Art Chan vs Michelle Fang et al Demurrer of Defendants Michelle Fang and Artson Group International to Plaintiff’s First Amended Complaint. Defendant Fang’s demurrer to plaintiff Chan’s FAC... | |
March 10, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 23CV418969 Art Chan vs Michelle Fang et al Demurrer of Defendants Michelle Fang and Artson Group International to Plaintiff’s First Amended Complaint. Defendant Fang’s demurrer to plaintiff Chan’s FAC... | |
March 09, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 23CV418969 Art Chan vs Michelle Fang et al Demurrer of Defendants Michelle Fang and Artson Group International to Plaintiff’s First Amended Complaint. Defendant Fang’s demurrer to plaintiff Chan’s FAC... | |
March 08, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 23CV418969 Art Chan vs Michelle Fang et al Demurrer of Defendants Michelle Fang and Artson Group International to Plaintiff’s First Amended Complaint. Defendant Fang’s demurrer to plaintiff Chan’s FAC... | |
March 07, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 23CV418969 Art Chan vs Michelle Fang et al Demurrer of Defendants Michelle Fang and Artson Group International to Plaintiff’s First Amended Complaint. Defendant Fang’s demurrer to plaintiff Chan’s FAC... | |
March 06, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 23CV418969 Art Chan vs Michelle Fang et al Demurrer of Defendants Michelle Fang and Artson Group International to Plaintiff’s First Amended Complaint. Defendant Fang’s demurrer to plaintiff Chan’s FAC... | |
March 05, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 23CV418969 Art Chan vs Michelle Fang et al Demurrer of Defendants Michelle Fang and Artson Group International to Plaintiff’s First Amended Complaint. Defendant Fang’s demurrer to plaintiff Chan’s FAC... | |
December 12, 2023 | Hearing | Conference: Case Management | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Summons |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.