Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateOctober 30, 2023 |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
94798Proof00859e
Date: March 27, 202492279CaseM00cb7b
Date: February 20, 202492202Reque00c851
Date: February 17, 202485915Notic00ad94
Date: November 02, 202385656Civil023a48
Date: October 30, 202385656Summo032276
Date: October 30, 202385656Civil01301a
Date: October 30, 202385656COMPL0050d3
Date: October 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | 94798Proof00859e | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | 92279CaseM00cb7b | |
February 17, 2024 | Docket Event | 92202Reque00c851 | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | 85915Notic00ad94 | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | 85656Civil023a48 | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | 85656Summo032276 | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | 85656Civil01301a | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | 85656COMPL0050d3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.