Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
10 02 2023 08:30 Am filed a(n) Civil Unlimited (Request For Relief From Firea...) case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas E. Stevens presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2023 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited (Request For Relief From Firea...) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition for Relief from Firearms Prohibition RCD / Department 13 |
|
October 06, 2023 | Hearing on Petition for Relief from Firearms Prohibition | ||
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Master Jury Trial (UD) RCD / Department 13 |
|
October 02, 2023 | Master Jury Trial (UD) | ||
September 01, 2023 | Notice of Hearing | ||
September 01, 2023 | Hearing on Petition for Relief from Firearms Prohibition scheduled for 10/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 13 | ||
September 01, 2023 | Master Jury Trial (UD) scheduled for 10/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 13 | ||
September 01, 2023 | Case assigned to Hon. Thomas Stevens in Department 13 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse | ||
September 01, 2023 | Petition for Relief for Firearms Prohibition | ||
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.