Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
I Han Hsu, Han Hsu, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Evan Blickenstaff, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Joscelyn C. Jones presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2023 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited (Civil Harassment) |
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 | Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing | ||
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Updated -- I Han Hsu (Petitioner):First Name changed from Han to I Han Party |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended CH-110 Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Issued and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Updated -- CH-110 Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment): Status Date changed from 06/29/2023 to 06/29/2023 Result: Granted Status changed from Pending in WQ to Issued and Filed Document |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Joscelyn Jones in Department 105 Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse Assignment |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 07/20/2023 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at HHJ / Department 519 Event |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
CH-100 Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order Filed by: Han Hsu (Petitioner) As to: Evan Blickenstaff (Respondent) Document |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
CH-110 Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Pending in WQ by: Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.