We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Fernando Ramirez ,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
Michael Kim ,
against
Anvil Builders Inc, A California Corporation ,
in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
This case was filed in
Alameda County
Superior Courts
Superior with James R. Reilly presiding.
Filing Date
June 21, 2023
Category
Unlimited Civil (Other Employment Complaint Case)
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2023
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Matter Type
General Employment
Filing Court House
Superior
Defendants
Anvil Builders Inc, A California Corporation
Case Events for
Fernando Ramirez v. Anvil Builders Inc, A California Corporation
Date
Type
Description
November 15, 2023
Initial Case Management Conference
June 22, 2023
Docket Event
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Event
June 22, 2023
Docket Event
Case assigned to Hon. James Reilly in Department 25 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse Assignment
June 21, 2023
Docket Event
Complaint Filed by: FERNANDO RAMIREZ (Plaintiff) As to: ANVIL BUILDERS INC, a California corporation (Defendant) Document
Get Document
June 21, 2023
Docket Event
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: FERNANDO RAMIREZ (Plaintiff) As to: ANVIL BUILDERS INC, a California corporation (Defendant) Document
Get Document
June 21, 2023
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment Filed by: Clerk Document
June 21, 2023
Docket Event
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk Document
June 21, 2023
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: FERNANDO RAMIREZ (Plaintiff) As to: ANVIL BUILDERS INC, a California corporation (Defendant) Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.