Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Christensen, Eric, Christensen, Liane, filed a(n) (02) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate case against County Of Butte, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Benson, Stephen E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenson, Stephen E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2023 |
Category(02) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Amended Complaint
Date: January 12, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: June 26, 2024Proof of Service
Date: January 12, 2024Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: December 22, 2023Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: December 29, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2024 |
Amended Petition/Complaint Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
January 12, 2024 |
Amended Petition/Complaint Amended Complaint |
||
January 12, 2024 | Proof of Service | ||
December 29, 2023 |
Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint Proof of Service of Summons Filed |
||
December 22, 2023 |
Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
December 15, 2023 | Summons Issued and Filed | ||
December 15, 2023 |
Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate (CCP Section 1085), Writ of Administrative Mandate Petition - No Fee |
||
December 15, 2023 | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.