Jasmine Franco,
filed a(n)
Harassment -
Torts
case
against
Juan Locoppillar,
in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
This case was filed in
Alameda County
Superior Courts
Superior with Elizabeth A. Grimes presiding.
Case Details for
Jasmine Franco v. Juan Locoppillar
Case Events for
Jasmine Franco v. Juan Locoppillar
Date
Type
Description
July 18, 2023
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees by: Document
July 18, 2023
Docket Event
Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing) Minute Order
July 18, 2023
Docket Event
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2023 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at HHJ / Department 519 updated: Result Date to 07/18/2023 Result Type to Held Event
July 18, 2023
Docket Event
On the Complaint filed by Jasmine Franco on 06/02/2023, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action Dismissal
June 22, 2023
Docket Event
Proof of Service - Non Service Filed by: Jasmine Franco (Petitioner) As to: Juan Locoppillar (Respondent) Document
June 21, 2023
Docket Event
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 519 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/18/2023 09:00 AM Event
June 21, 2023
Docket Event
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2023 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 519 Event
June 21, 2023
Docket Event
Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing) Minute Order
June 21, 2023
Docket Event
CH-116 Order on Request to Continue Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk Document